NV SB126 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 450.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 450.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a program to provide loans to small business enterprises, minority-owned business enterprises, women-owned business enterprises and disadvantaged business enterprises. (BDR 18-21)
Title
Establishes a program to provide loans to small business enterprises, minority-owned business enterprises, women-owned business enterprises and disadvantaged business enterprises. (BDR 18-21)
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 450. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 3, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 990.) |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 159.) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |