NV SB116 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-27 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-27 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing warnings against trespassing. (BDR 15-76)
Title
Revises provisions governing warnings against trespassing. (BDR 15-76)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 661.) To printer. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 80.) To printer. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |