NV SB110 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 521.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 521.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the issuance of business licenses in certain counties and cities in this State. (BDR 20-820)
Title
Revises provisions governing the issuance of business licenses in certain counties and cities in this State. (BDR 20-820)
Sponsors
Sen. John Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 521. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-03 | Assembly Amendment No. 594 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-29 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 594.) To printer. | |
2011-05-29 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-25 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-20 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-19 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-18 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-18 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 47.) To printer. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2011-02-03 | From printer. | |
2011-02-02 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |