NV SB1 | 2020 | 32nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - In Senate. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to property; authorizing certain courts to grant a stay in certain proceedings concerning eviction; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes certain courts to grant a stay for certain evictions. (BDR 3-26)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2020-08-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate.
2020-08-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2020-08-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2020-08-03AssemblyTo committee.
2020-08-03AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole.
2020-08-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2020-08-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.
2020-08-01SenateRead second time.
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2020-07-31SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2020-07-30SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback