NV SB1 | 2016 | 30th Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts the Southern Nevada Tourism Improvements Act. (BDR S-9)
Title
Enacts the Southern Nevada Tourism Improvements Act. (BDR S-9)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-17 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2. |
2016-10-14 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2016-10-14 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 12 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2016-10-14 | Senate | In Senate. |
2016-10-14 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2016-10-14 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2016-10-14 | Assembly | To printer. |
2016-10-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Excused: 1.) |
2016-10-14 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2016-10-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 12.) |
2016-10-14 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2016-10-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | To committee. |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Referred to Committee of the Whole. |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2016-10-12 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly. |
2016-10-11 | Senate | To printer. |
2016-10-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) |
2016-10-11 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2016-10-11 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 4.) |
2016-10-11 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2016-10-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2016-10-10 | Senate | To committee. |
2016-10-10 | Senate | Read first time. |
2016-10-10 | Senate | From printer. |
2016-10-09 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To printer. |