NV AJR2 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - File No. 17.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require the recognition of all marriages regardless of gender. (BDR C-690)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require the recognition of all marriages regardless of gender. (BDR C-690)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05AssemblyFile No. 17.
2017-05-05AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
2017-05-02AssemblySenate Amendment No. 515 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-01SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.
2017-04-27SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for Monday, May 1, 2017.
2017-04-26SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-04-25SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 515.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-10SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2017-03-10SenateIn Senate.
2017-03-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-03-09AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-03-08AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 23.) To printer.
2017-03-07AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2017-02-02AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-02-01AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback