NV AB98 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Legislature; reducing the number of legislative measures that may be requested for a regular legislative session; codifying into statute certain provisions of the Joint Standing Rules of the Senate and Assembly that authorize requests for legislative measures; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing legislative measures that may be requested for a regular legislative session. (BDR 17-67)
Sponsors
Sen. Robin Titus [R] | Rep. Richard McArthur [R] | Rep. Jill Dickman [R] | Rep. Heidi Kasama [R] |
Rep. Glen Leavitt [R] | Rep. Gregory Hafen [R] | Rep. Melissa Hardy [R] | Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] |
Rep. Thomas Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Exempt pursuant to subsection 4 of Joint Standing Rule 14.6. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7398/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB98.pdf |