NV AB93 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to emergency management; requiring a state of emergency or declaration of disaster proclaimed by the Governor to terminate after 15 days unless the Legislature expressly approves a continuance of the emergency or disaster; prohibiting the Governor from proclaiming the existence of a state of emergency or declaration of disaster due to the same occurrence or threatened occurrence as that of an emergency or disaster which has terminated unless the Legislature expressly approves the proclamation; prohibiting the exercise of certain powers by the Governor without the express approval of the Legislative Commission or the Legislature; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to states of emergency or declarations of disaster proclaimed by the Governor. (BDR 36-41)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7384/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB93.pdf |