NV AB93 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 433.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 433.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of a pilot diversion program within the Department of Corrections to provide treatment for alcohol or drug abuse or mental illness to certain probation violators. (BDR S-509)
Title
Provides for the establishment of a pilot diversion program within the Department of Corrections to provide treatment for alcohol or drug abuse or mental illness to certain probation violators. (BDR S-509)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 433. | |
2011-06-13 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-06 | From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-06-05 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-06-05 | In Senate. | |
2011-06-05 | To Senate. | |
2011-06-05 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-06-04 | To printer. | |
2011-06-04 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 8, Excused: 4.) | |
2011-06-04 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2011-06-04 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 900.) | |
2011-06-04 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-06-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-27 | To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 371.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. | |
2011-04-26 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-28 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2011-01-14 | From printer. | |
2011-01-13 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |