NV AB86 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 260.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 260.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to emergencies; revising provisions relating to the recovery of expenses incurred by certain governmental entities in extinguishing a fire or meeting an emergency; authorizing, with certain exceptions, counties, cities and certain general improvement districts to bring an action to recover certain expenses related to wildfires; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to the recovery of certain expenses and costs incurred in extinguishing certain fires and emergencies. (BDR 42-111)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 260. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 643 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 643.) To printer. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 120.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |