NV AB84 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 480.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 480.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state resources; providing for the issuance of state general obligation bonds to protect, preserve and obtain the benefits of the property and natural and cultural resources of the State of Nevada; providing for the use of the proceeds of the bonds; repealing the prospective extension of the period for the issuance of certain bonds; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for the issuance of state general obligation bonds to protect, preserve and obtain the benefits of the property and natural and cultural resources of the State of Nevada. (BDR S-326)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Chapter 480. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 910.) To printer. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Notice of exemption. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-21 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |