NV AB71 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 96.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 96.
Summary
Authorizes the Real Estate Division of the Department of Business and Industry to keep confidential certain records and information obtained in regulating the sale of subdivided land. (BDR 10-431)
Title
Authorizes the Real Estate Division of the Department of Business and Industry to keep confidential certain records and information obtained in regulating the sale of subdivided land. (BDR 10-431)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 96. | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 474.) To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=166 |