NV AB7 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Chapter 11.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Chapter 11.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state purchasing; authorizing the Department of Transportation to execute certain contracts for the services of an independent contractor without filing the contracts with the State Board of Examiners for approval; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing contracts with independent contractors executed by the Department of Transportation. (BDR 27-364)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Chapter 11. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-18 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-15 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |