NV AB7 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 534.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 534.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to gaming. (BDR 41-333)
Title
Revises provisions relating to gaming. (BDR 41-333)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 534. |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | To printer. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 980 concurred in. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 980.) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 621.) To printer. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 64.) To printer. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2012-12-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2012-12-19 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |