NV AB69 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - To committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to economic development; revising provisions relating to the membership of the Board of Economic Development; revising provisions governing the appointment of the Executive Director of the Office of Economic Development within the Office of the Governor; renaming and revising provisions relating to the Division of Motion Pictures within the Office of Economic Development; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing economic development. (BDR 18-290)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04AssemblyTo committee.
2021-02-01AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-11-18AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback