NV AB69 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 608.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to autonomous vehicles. (BDR 43-246)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to autonomous vehicles. (BDR 43-246)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 608.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1129 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-03SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1129.) To printer.
2017-06-03SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-06-02SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
2017-06-02SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-02AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-02AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-06-02AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.)
2017-06-02AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 691.)
2017-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-13AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2016-11-17AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback