NV AB65 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to ethics in government; making various changes relating to the provisions governing ethics in government; enacting the Nevada Legislative Ethics Law; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to ethics in government. (BDR 23-257)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-02AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2021-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.
2021-05-30SenateRead second time.
2021-05-30SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-05-29SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2021-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2021-05-29AssemblyTo Senate.
2021-05-29AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-05-29AssemblyTo printer.
2021-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 9, Excused: 2.)
2021-05-29AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2021-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 777.)
2021-05-29AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2021-05-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-05-26AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2021-05-26AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-04-09AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 8, 2021.
2021-02-04AssemblyTo committee.
2021-02-01AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-11-18AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback