NV AB61 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to city elections; revising, under certain circumstances, the deadline for the governing body of a city to canvass and transmit the election returns from a city election; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the canvass of city elections. (BDR 24-371)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-15 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2022-12-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/9617/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/AB/AB61.pdf |