NV AB6 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes courts to allow certain victims of sex trafficking or involuntary servitude who have been convicted of engaging in or soliciting prostitution to have their judgments of conviction vacated. (BDR 14-366)
Title
Authorizes courts to allow certain victims of sex trafficking or involuntary servitude who have been convicted of engaging in or soliciting prostitution to have their judgments of conviction vacated. (BDR 14-366)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65. | |
2011-05-13 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-10 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-04-26 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-22 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 444.) To printer. | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2010-12-16 | From printer. | |
2010-12-13 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |