NV AB571 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 515.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 515.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing prohibitions on smoking tobacco. (BDR 15-1294)
Title
Revises provisions governing prohibitions on smoking tobacco. (BDR 15-1294)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 515. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-06 | Action reconsidered. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-06 | From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-06-05 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2011-06-05 | In Senate. | |
2011-06-05 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 19.) To Senate. | |
2011-06-05 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-06-04 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 924.) To printer. | |
2011-06-04 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-06-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-05-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-05-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |