NV AB561 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 475.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 475.
Summary
Eliminates the Consumer Affairs Division of the Department of Business and Industry for the 2009-2011 biennium and transfers certain duties and powers of the Division. (BDR 18-1201)
Title
Eliminates the Consumer Affairs Division of the Department of Business and Industry for the 2009-2011 biennium and transfers certain duties and powers of the Division. (BDR 18-1201)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 475. | |
2009-06-04 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-06-03 | To enrollment. | |
2009-06-03 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-06-02 | To printer. | |
2009-06-01 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Recede from Senate Amendment No. 973. | |
2009-05-31 | Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee. | |
2009-05-31 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | Senate Amendment No. 973 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Amendment No. 973 not concurred in. To Senate. | |
2009-05-30 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-29 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 973.) To printer. | |
2009-05-29 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-28 | To printer. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) | |
2009-05-28 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-28 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 951.) | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-05-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1152 |