NV AB552 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Chapter 387.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Chapter 387.
Summary
Makes various changes regarding certain tax collection allowances and the payment of certain taxes to the State. (BDR 32-1188)
Title
Makes various changes regarding certain tax collection allowances and the payment of certain taxes to the State. (BDR 32-1188)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Chapter 387. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. | |
2009-05-31 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-31 | To Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) | |
2009-05-31 | Made Special Order of Business for Sunday, May 31, 2009, at 7:15 p.m. | |
2009-05-29 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 8.) | |
2009-05-29 | Returned to Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-18 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-18 | To printer. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Not voting: 1.) | |
2009-05-18 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-18 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 831.) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-14 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-05-06 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-05-05 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1118 |