NV AB539 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to counties; authorizing a board of county commissioners to create by ordinance the office of county counsel; providing for the appointment of a county counsel; establishing the qualifications of a county counsel; authorizing a county counsel to appoint deputies and certain other staff; setting forth the powers and duties of a county counsel; revising the responsibilities of the district attorney when the office of county counsel is created; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Authorizes a board of county commissioners to create the office of county counsel. (BDR 20-1264)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Action of passage reconsidered. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 7, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Waiver granted effective: April 10, 2019. |