NV AB528 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Chapter 469.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Chapter 469.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the transfer of money received to carry out provisions relating to the medical use of marijuana for certain purposes. (BDR 40-1182)
Title
Authorizes the transfer of money received to carry out provisions relating to the medical use of marijuana for certain purposes. (BDR 40-1182)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Chapter 469. | |
2011-06-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-03 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-01 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-30 | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-30 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-30 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-05-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2011-05-27 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-26 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-05-25 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 755.) To printer. | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Notice of exemption. | |
2011-03-30 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |