NV AB521 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487.
Summary
Revises provisions governing coverage for cancer as an occupational disease of firefighters. (BDR 53-278)
Title
Revises provisions governing coverage for cancer as an occupational disease of firefighters. (BDR 53-278)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-31 | Senate Amendment Nos. 970 and 971 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-30 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-29 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 970 and 971.) To printer. | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-16 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-05-16 | Taken from Second Reading File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-20 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-20 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-04-16 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 282.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer. | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-24 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1023 |