NV AB52 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter 510.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter 510.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public lands; revising the membership and duties of the Land Use Planning Advisory Council; authorizing the removal of certain voting members before the expiration of their term under certain circumstances; requiring the election of a vice chair of the Advisory Council; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes related to the Land Use Planning Advisory Council. (BDR 26-342)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Chapter 510. |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 509 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 509.) To printer. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 171.) To printer. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |