NV AB511 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 577.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 577.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making appropriations to the Investigation Division of the Department of Public Safety for the replacement of vehicles and computer software and hardware; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes appropriations to the Investigation Division of the Department of Public Safety for the replacement of vehicles and computer software and hardware. (BDR S-1194)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Chapter 577. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 867.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |