NV AB511 | 2011 | 76th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Chapter 472.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises certain provisions governing transportation. (BDR 43-1109)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises certain provisions governing transportation. (BDR 43-1109)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-17 Chapter 472.
2011-06-16 Approved by the Governor.
2011-06-16 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2011-06-06 Senate Amendment No. 938 concurred in. To enrollment.
2011-06-06 In Assembly.
2011-06-06 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
2011-06-06 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2011-06-06 Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 938.) To printer.
2011-06-06 Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2011-06-06 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-06-02 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2011-06-02 In Senate.
2011-05-31 To Senate.
2011-05-31 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2011-05-30 To printer.
2011-05-30 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.)
2011-05-30 Dispensed with reprinting.
2011-05-30 Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 785.)
2011-05-30 Placed on General File.
2011-05-30 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-04-26 Exemption effective.
2011-04-26 To committee.
2011-04-26 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2011-04-25 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 320.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
2011-04-25 Placed on Second Reading File.
2011-04-25 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-04-06 Notice of eligibility for exemption.
2011-03-30 From printer. To committee.
2011-03-28 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback