NV AB503 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 443.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 443.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Office of the Secretary of State for the second phase of the replacement of the Electronic Secretary of State System (ESOS) software and hardware. (BDR S-1193)
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Office of the Secretary of State for the second phase of the replacement of the Electronic Secretary of State System (ESOS) software and hardware. (BDR S-1193)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 443. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | To printer. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1038.) |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |