NV AB503 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Chapter 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Chapter 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises certain provisions governing the use of money in the Wildlife Obligated Reserve Account. (BDR 45-1091)
Title
Revises certain provisions governing the use of money in the Wildlife Obligated Reserve Account. (BDR 45-1091)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Chapter 473. | |
2011-06-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Amendment Nos. 964 and 982 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-06 | In Assembly. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-06 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint . | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 982.) To printer. | |
2011-06-06 | Action reconsidered. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) | |
2011-06-06 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 964.) To printer. | |
2011-06-06 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-06-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-06-03 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. | |
2011-06-03 | In Senate. | |
2011-06-03 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2011-06-03 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 865.) To printer. | |
2011-06-02 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-06-02 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-20 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-20 | To committee. | |
2011-04-20 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-19 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 315.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-14 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-03-30 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |