NV AB496 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes a supplemental appropriation to the Office of the Secretary of State for a projected shortfall related to credit card processing fees. (BDR S-1168)
Title
Makes a supplemental appropriation to the Office of the Secretary of State for a projected shortfall related to credit card processing fees. (BDR S-1168)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 210. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |