NV AB493 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public employees; establishing the maximum allowed salaries for certain state employees; making appropriations from the State General Fund and State Highway Fund for increases in the salaries of certain employees of the State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for compensation of state employees. (BDR S-1173)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 309. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 16, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |