NV AB492 | 2009 | 75th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 451.

Summary

Imposes certain requirements on the enactment of legislation and the provision of notice regarding certain tax abatements and exemptions. (BDR 32-602)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes certain requirements on the enactment of legislation and the provision of notice regarding certain tax abatements and exemptions. (BDR 32-602)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-04 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 451.
2009-06-01 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2009-05-31 To enrollment.
2009-05-31 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
2009-05-30 To printer.
2009-05-30 In Assembly.
2009-05-30 To Assembly.
2009-05-30 Senate Amendment No. 822 receded from.
2009-05-22 In Senate.
2009-05-22 Senate Amendment No. 822 not concurred in. To Senate.
2009-05-21 In Assembly.
2009-05-20 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2009-05-20 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2009-05-19 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 822.) To printer.
2009-05-18 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-04-21 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
2009-04-21 In Senate.
2009-04-21 To Senate.
2009-04-21 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2009-04-20 To printer.
2009-04-20 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
2009-04-20 Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2009-04-20 Dispensed with reprinting.
2009-04-20 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 481.)
2009-04-20 Placed on Second Reading File.
2009-04-20 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-04-09 Notice of eligibility for exemption.
2009-03-24 From printer. To committee.
2009-03-23 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback