NV AB49 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 399.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing crimes. (BDR 15-158)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing crimes. (BDR 15-158)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-08AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 399.
2015-06-01AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-30AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-05-28AssemblySenate Amendment Nos. 917, 932 and 964 concurred in.
2015-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-05-22SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint .
2015-05-22SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 964.) To printer.
2015-05-22SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
2015-05-22SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 932.) To printer.
2015-05-22SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-05-22SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 917.) To printer.
2015-05-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-05-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-23SenateIn Senate.
2015-04-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) To Senate.
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 365.) To printer.
2015-04-20AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-02AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2014-12-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2014-12-20AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=135
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB49.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB49_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB49_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB49_R3.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB49_R4.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB49_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=509&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=49&fldBillname=AB49
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1104&fldReprint=4&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=49&fldBillname=AB49

Bill Comments 750

feedback