NV AB486 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing the distribution of the governmental services tax. (BDR 43-978)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the distribution of the governmental services tax. (BDR 43-978)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 514.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateRead second time.
2017-06-04SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-25SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-05-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
2017-05-23SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 442.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback