NV AB483 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 540.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes relating to the compensation of certain public school employees. (BDR 34-1198)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to the compensation of certain public school employees. (BDR 34-1198)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 540.
2015-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2015-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-05-30SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-05-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-05-29SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2015-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-29AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.)
2015-05-27AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-03-26AssemblyNotice of exemption.
2015-03-25AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1073
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB483.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB483_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1142&fldReprint=0&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=483&fldBillname=AB483
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1218&fldReprint=0&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=483&fldBillname=AB483
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1142&fldReprint=0&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=481&fldBillname=AB481
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1218&fldReprint=0&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=481&fldBillname=AB481

Bill Comments

feedback