NV AB481 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 528.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides additional authority for the enforcement of the laws prohibiting deceptive trade practices. (BDR 52-1168)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides additional authority for the enforcement of the laws prohibiting deceptive trade practices. (BDR 52-1168)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 528.
2015-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-04AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-06-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2015-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2015-05-20AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2015-05-20AssemblyTaken from General File.
2015-05-20AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-05-19AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 708.) To printer.
2015-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-15AssemblyTo committee.
2015-04-15AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor.
2015-04-15AssemblyRead second time.
2015-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Commerce and Labor.
2015-03-26AssemblyNotice of exemption.
2015-03-25AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback