NV AB481 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Division of State Library and Archives of the Department of Administration to retain money received for providing certain services to local governments. (BDR 19-1134)
Title
Authorizes the Division of State Library and Archives of the Department of Administration to retain money received for providing certain services to local governments. (BDR 19-1134)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-02 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366. |
2013-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-05 | Assembly | Amended notice of eligibility: Exempt. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-27 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |