NV AB478 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 179.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 179.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the limitation on the principal amount of bonds and other securities that may be issued by the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to finance certain projects. (BDR S-887)
Title
Revises the limitation on the principal amount of bonds and other securities that may be issued by the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to finance certain projects. (BDR S-887)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 179. | |
2011-05-28 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-27 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-25 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-23 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-19 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2011-04-19 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-18 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 199.) To printer. | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-30 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |