NV AB475 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 576.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 31-975)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 31-975)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 576.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1150 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-05SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-06-05SenateTo printer.
2017-06-05SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.)
2017-06-05SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-06-05SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1150.)
2017-06-04SenateRead second time.
2017-06-04SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
2017-06-04SenateTaken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-06-04SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-04SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-06-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-01AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-01AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-31AssemblyTo printer.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.)
2017-05-31AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1027.)
2017-05-31AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-31AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-13AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.
2017-04-03AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback