NV AB474 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 605.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes relating to drug overdoses and prescribing and using drugs. (BDR 40-1102)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to drug overdoses and prescribing and using drugs. (BDR 40-1102)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 605.
2017-06-05AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2017-06-01SenateRead second time.
2017-06-01SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2017-05-16SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 277.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback