NV AB473 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 436.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 436.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the provisions governing the fees charged to defray the costs of producing license plates. (BDR 43-1170)
Title
Revises the provisions governing the fees charged to defray the costs of producing license plates. (BDR 43-1170)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 436. |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 5, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-05 | Assembly | Amended notice of eligibility: Exempt. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-27 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |