NV AB472 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 604.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes policies for reducing recidivism rates and improving other outcomes for youth in the juvenile justice system. (BDR 5-918)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes policies for reducing recidivism rates and improving other outcomes for youth in the juvenile justice system. (BDR 5-918)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 604.
2017-06-05AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-03AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1102 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-02SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1102.) To printer.
2017-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2017-05-25AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 844.) To printer.
2017-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 231.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback