NV AB465 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Chapter 220. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Chapter 220. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the state militia; revising the age requirements for enlisted personnel and commissioned officers; revising provisions governing the Adjutant General of the Office of the Military; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the state militia. (BDR 36-1192)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Assembly | Chapter 220. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 747 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 747.) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | To printer. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 621.) |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |