NV AB465 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation to the Division of Water Resources of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources for the repair and maintenance of the South Fork Dam; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Division of Water Resources of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources for the repair and maintenance of the South Fork Dam. (BDR S-1105)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |