NV AB464 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 28.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 28.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies certain technical corrections made to NRS and Statutes of Nevada. (BDR S-944)
Title
Ratifies certain technical corrections made to NRS and Statutes of Nevada. (BDR S-944)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 28. | |
2011-05-09 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-06 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-02 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-28 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-27 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-26 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-25 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-22 | Read second time. | |
2011-04-20 | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-19 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-11 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-04-11 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-04 | Read second time. | |
2011-04-01 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-03-29 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |