NV AB462 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-615)
Title
Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-615)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 509. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 677 concurred in. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2015-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 677.) To printer. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) To Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 519.) To printer. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |