NV AB46 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing services provided to persons with mental illness and other disabilities. (BDR 39-132)
Title
Revises provisions governing services provided to persons with mental illness and other disabilities. (BDR 39-132)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269. |
2017-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 748 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 748.) To printer. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 171.) To printer. |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-11-17 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |