NV AB46 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 444.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 444.
Summary
Makes various changes concerning the right of certain persons to purchase or possess a firearm. (BDR 14-271)
Title
Makes various changes concerning the right of certain persons to purchase or possess a firearm. (BDR 14-271)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 444. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-31 | To enrollment. | |
2009-05-31 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-30 | To printer. | |
2009-05-30 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 621 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-05-27 | Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee. | |
2009-05-27 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Amendment No. 621 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-20 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendment No. 621 not concurred in. To Senate. | |
2009-05-19 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 621.) To printer. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-20 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-17 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-17 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-16 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 213.) To printer. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-07 | From printer. | |
2008-12-06 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=109 |