NV AB45 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 505.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to public office. (BDR 24-426)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to public office. (BDR 24-426)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 505.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblyTo enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyConference report adopted by Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 953. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
2017-06-03AssemblyConference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-01SenateSenate Amendment No. 953 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
2017-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-29AssemblySenate Amendment No. 953 not concurred in. To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-25SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 953.) To printer.
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 521.) To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2016-11-17AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=118
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB45.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB45_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB45_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB45_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=382&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=45&fldBillname=AB45
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=382&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=428&fldBillname=AB428
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1027&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=45&fldBillname=AB45

Bill Comments

feedback